skip to content

Hartman, Michael

CPSO#: 94986

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Mar 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
400-955 Major Mackenzie Dr
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone: 2893570100
Fax: 2893570111 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

655 Bay Street
Suite 1101
Toronto ON  M5G 2K4
Canada
Phone: 4162173949
Fax: 4162173950
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Hartman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hartman ( CPSO# 94986 )

Business Address:
7330 Yonge Street
Suite 217
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y7
Phone Number: (905) 731-5928

Business Address:
Suite 1101
655 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2K4
Phone Number: (416) 217-3949

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL HARTMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARTMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 02 May 2011 to 27 May 2011
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 07 May 2012 to 03 Jun 2012
EL - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2015