skip to content

Hartman, Jason

CPSO#: 98595

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Feb 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7330 Yonge Street, unit 120
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y7
Phone: (905) 707-1777
Fax: (905) 707-0616 Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JASON HARTMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARTMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2015