skip to content

Hart, Michael Frederick

CPSO#: 94570

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 23 Jan 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
642 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3G6
Phone: (226) 700-9739
Fax: 866-893-6727 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael Hart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hart ( CPSO# 94570 )

Business Address:
642 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3G6
Phone Number: (226) 700-9739

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage and Retrieval Services Tel: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: 416-398-5932
Instructions: Patients seeking a copy/transfer of their medical record can contact Record Storage and Retrieval Services
Date Received: 19 Jul 2017

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 26 Oct 2010 to 18 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Jan 2011 to 25 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Oct 2011 to 25 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 23 Jan 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 23 Jan 2019 Active
             As from January 23, 2019, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Michael Frederick
            Hart, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Hart to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. MICHAEL FREDERICK HART  
                                          ("Dr. Hart")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended;

                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Hart, certificate of registration number 94570, am a member of the
                  College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Hart, acknowledge that the College conducted two (2)
                  investigations bearing File Numbers 7214685 and 7214134 (the
                  "Investigations") into whether I, in my practice, engaged in professional
                  misconduct and/or am incompetent.

            (4)   I, Dr. Hart, acknowledge that, if an original copy of this Undertaking as
                  signed by me is accepted by the ICR Committee, the College may also
                  deliver a caution in person.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Hart, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
                  (the "Effective Date").

            (6)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hart, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the College (the
                        "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for six (6)
                        months ("Clinical Supervision"), as outlined in the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking attached hereto as Appendix "A", the
                        Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached hereto as Appendix
                        "B", and as set out below.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hart, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum:

                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the "IEP",
                              attached hereto as Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting with me at my Practice Location (as defined
                              below), or another location approved by the College, to
                              discuss practice improvement recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) After the initial meeting described in section (6)(b)(ii),
                              meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, biweekly for two (2) visits, then
                              monthly for three (3) visits, and then once again after two
                              (2) months;
                  
                        (iv)  During the first two (2) months of Clinical Supervision,
                              perform direct observation of my in-person assessments and
                              telemedicine assessments for three (3) half days and with a
                              minimum of five (5) patients per visit;
                  
                        (v)   Review at least ten (10) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting to assess for the quality of documentation and care
                              and to make practice recommendations;
                  
                        (vi)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (vii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations;

                        (viii)Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (ix)  Submit written reports to the College at three (3) months of
                              Clinical Supervision and at six (6) months of Clinical
                              Supervision, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor
                              has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hart, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected
                        by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as
                        the areas of concern identified in the report of the medical
                        inspector dated October 21, 2016, and concerns that may arise
                        during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hart, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the terms of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Hart, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the Effective Date.

                  (f)   I, Dr. Hart, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Hart, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.

                  (h)   I, Dr. Hart, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as
                        a result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (7)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hart, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B",
                        including all of the following professional education (the
                        "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   Clinical Supervision;
                  
                        (ii)  review, discuss with Clinical Supervisor, and summarize the
                              applicable College policies and clinical practice guidelines;
                              and
                  
                        (iii) any additional education recommended by my Clinical
                              Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hart, undertake to submit to the College my written
                        summaries of the applicable College polices and clinical practice
                        guidelines, as detailed in the IEP, within three (3) months of the
                        Effective Date.

                  (c)   I, Dr. Hart, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (8)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hart, undertake that, approximately six (6)  months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (6)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").
                        I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hart, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking.

                  (c)   I, Dr. Hart, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the
                        Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment.

                  (d)   I, Dr. Hart, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will
                        be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment
                        may form the basis of further action by the College.

            (9)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hart, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of the Effective Date.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hart, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hart, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.

                  (d)   I, Dr. Hart, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Hart, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Hart, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Hart, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Hart, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (14)  I, Dr. Hart, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (15)  I, Dr. Hart, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (16)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hart, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hart, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Two College investigations were conducted into whether Dr.
                              Hart, in his practice, engaged in professional misconduct
                              and/or is incompetent.  As a result of the investigations:
                  
                                    Dr. Hart will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                                    Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.

                                    Dr. Hart will engage in professional education on
                                    appropriate use of social media by physicians,
                                    advertising by physicians, telemedicine, marijuana for
                                    medical purposes, and medical recordkeeping.

                                    Dr. Hart's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    selected by the College within six (6) months of the
                                    end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hart, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Hart, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and

                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Hart, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Hart, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my
                  completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 23, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Michael Frederick Hart to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 23, 2019:

Two College investigations were conducted into whether Dr. Hart, in his practice, engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent. As a result of the investigations:

Dr. Hart will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.

Dr. Hart will engage in professional education on appropriate use of social media by physicians, advertising by physicians, telemedicine, marijuana for medical purposes, and medical recordkeeping.

Dr. Hart’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 23, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: December 15, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)