skip to content

Hart, Lara Michal

CPSO#: 96171

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: 416-242-1000 Ext. 21400
Fax: 416-242-1095 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:27 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LARA MICHAL HART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2015