skip to content

Harry, Philip Valentine

CPSO#: 23670

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Jun 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Apr 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2019

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: December 4, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Philip Valentine Harry to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 4, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Harry engaged in professional misconduct and is incompetent in his general medicine practice. In the face of the investigation, Dr. Harry has agreed to resign from the College, effective December 31, 2019, and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)