skip to content

Harris, Simon Andrew

CPSO#: 91404

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 402
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 431-5452
Fax: (416) 431-6910 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Harris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Harris ( CPSO# 91167 )
Dr. S. Harris ( CPSO# 91404 )

Business Address:
601-89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 281-9898

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
First Floor East Wing
Room 1E449
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5185

Business Address:
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 402
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 431-5452

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SIMON ANDREW HARRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014