skip to content

Harris, Kenneth Arthur

CPSO#: 30737

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
566 Louise St
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-2422 Ext. 6318
Fax: 613 774-7206 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kenneth Harris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2012

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Command Services (London) Limited 100 Piccadilly Street London, Ontario N6A 1R8
Date Received: 16 Apr 2009

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 27 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KENNETH ARTHUR HARRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1979