skip to content

Harris, Howard Mitchel

CPSO#: 27116

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jul 2021
EXPIRY DATE
20 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Howard Harris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 15 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 2021