skip to content

Harrington, Jennifer Jean

CPSO#: 94111

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 28 Sep 2021
EXPIRY DATE
28 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 12 Dec 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Adelaide Faculty of Health, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 20 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 11 Dec 2015
CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2015
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Sep 2021