skip to content

Harricharan, Tanujaa Rajkumari

CPSO#: 86880

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lublin, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 18
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 8B7
Phone: (905) 319-2000 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. T. Harricharan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Harricharan ( CPSO# 86880 )

Business Address:
Suite 18
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 319-2000


Corporation Name: Dr. T. Harricharan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Harricharan ( CPSO# 86880 )

Business Address:
Suite 18
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 319-2000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TANUJAA RAJKUMARI HARRICHARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRICHARAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Jul 2007 to 07 Oct 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 08 Oct 2007 to 16 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 17 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009