skip to content

Harpur, George David

CPSO#: 19499

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jun 1965
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 23 Jul 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 220
7275 Hwy # 6
Tobermory ON  N0H 2R0
Phone: (519) 596-2305
Fax: (519) 596-2979 Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site Lions Head
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site Wiarton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1965
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 23 Jul 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 23 Jul 2019 Active
             As from July 23, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. George David Harpur,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Harpur to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:
                  
                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. GEORGE DAVID HARPUR
                                          ("Dr. Harpur")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Harpur, certificate of registration number 19499, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Harpur, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File Number 1104705 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct in my family medicine practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Harpur, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Harpur, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "A", including successful completion of individualized
                        instruction in professionalism/communications satisfactory to the
                        College, with an instructor selected by the College ("Professional
                        Education").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Harpur, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education within one (1)
                        month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will
                        determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully
                        completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Harpur, undertake to complete this requirement within six
                        (6) months or, if no satisfactory program is available by that
                        time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Harpur, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (6)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Harpur, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Harpur, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Harpur, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Harpur, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Harpur, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (11)  I, Dr. Harpur, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (12)  I, Dr. Harpur, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (13)  Public Register
                  (a)   I, Dr. Harpur, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Harpur, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Harpur
                              engaged in professional misconduct in his family medicine
                              practice.  As a result of the investigation:
                  
                              Dr. Harpur will engage in professional education in
                              communications.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Harpur, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Harpur, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into my practice;
                        and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (15)  I, Dr. Harpur, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Harpur, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff,
                  to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  
                  (c)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: July 23, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. George David Harpur to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 23, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Harpur engaged in professional misconduct in his family medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Harpur will engage in professional education in communications.