skip to content

Haroun, Gamal Wanis

CPSO#: 25249

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jan 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Jan 2020
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2019
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jan 2020

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: June 6, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Gamal Wanis Haroun to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 6, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Haroun engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his diagnostic radiology practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Haroun will engage in professional education in professional ethics.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 6, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)