skip to content

Haroon, Nigil

CPSO#: 88065

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Feb 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Feb 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:University of Kerala, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
1E - 425
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5634
Fax: (416) 603-4348 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nigil Haroon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Haroon ( CPSO# 88065 )
Dr. N. Nigil Haroon ( CPSO# 92245 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Rheumatology
399 Bathurst Street
1EW-425
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5634

Business Address:
Suite M277
865 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Phone Number: (705) 675-4791

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Dec 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 13 Dec 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 31 Jan 2008 to 23 Apr 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 24 Apr 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jan 2012
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2018

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2018 Active
             1.    Dr. Nigil Haroon may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of   Rheumatology  ,  University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Haroon  holds an academic appointment  at  the  rank  of  Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Haroon  no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.