skip to content

Haroon, Babar Ali

CPSO#: 89774

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:24 Aug 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 25 Aug 2008 to 21 Sep 2008
EL - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2009 to 30 Aug 2009
EL - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2009