skip to content

Gill, Harmander Singh

CPSO#: 88802

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 23 May 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 2011
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jan 2011 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 07 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2011
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 23 May 2019

Pending Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Gill’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Gill engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in failing to cooperate with a College investigation, from approximately April 2018 onwards, including by failing to cooperate with respect to observation of his practice and a requested interview; and failing to respond to inquiries from a College investigator, and to provide answers to questions from the investigator.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 23 May 2019


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 23 May 2019 Active

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Apr 2019
Summary:

On April 16, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Gill has committed an act of 
professional misconduct in that:  he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession; and he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Committee also found that Dr. Gill is 
incompetent. 
 
The Committee directed that the penalty hearing proceed on the scheduled hearing dates of May 
21 and 22, 2019. Dr. Gill brought a motion to re-open the hearing which was then scheduled to 
take place on May 21 and 22, 2019. On May 21, 2019, the Committee granted Dr. Gill’s motion to 
adjourn the motion to re-open the hearing on conditions including, that the motion to re-open the 
hearing be rescheduled to peremptory dates on July 2, 3 and 5, 2019, and that the Registrar 
suspend the certificate of registration of Dr. Gill effective 12:01 a.m. on Thursday, May 23, 2019, 
pending the final disposition of the discipline case, and subject to the right of Dr. Gill to move to 
vary the suspension order.

Hearing Date(s): April 1-2, 4-5 and April 8, 2019 Adjournment Motion: May 21, 2019 Motion to Re-open Hearing: July 2, 3 and 5, 2019 Motion to Vary a Discipline Order: May 24, 2019