skip to content

Harman, Lisa Michelle

CPSO#: 90674

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Dahl, Lisa Michelle (used until: 01 Sep 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Center
Emergency Department
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600 Ext. 4500 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

345 Oak Street West
North Bay ON  P1B 2T2
Canada
Phone: (705) 474-1400
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lisa Harman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Harman ( CPSO# 90674 )

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Centre
Emergency Department
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1A 0A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Business Address:
345 Oak Street West
North Bay ON  P1B 2T2
Phone Number: (705) 474-1400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LISA MICHELLE HARMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 06 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012