skip to content

Hariri, Farzad

CPSO#: 85260

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand Genesis Health
Unit 12
9080 yonge st.
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Phone: 289-597-7676 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 rolling hills dr
Orangeville ON  L9W4X9
Canada
Phone: 519-941-2410
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: F. Hariri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Hariri ( CPSO# 85260 )

Business Address:
2000 - 9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Phone Number: (289) 597-7676

Business Address:
12 - 9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Phone Number: (289) 597-7676

Business Address:
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9

Business Address:
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FARZAD HARIRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARIRI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
AVP - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011