skip to content

Hariri, Arvin

CPSO#: 96821

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 19 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Johns Hopkins University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
65 Third St
Welland ON  L3B 4W6 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

2435 Appleby Line
Burlington L7L0B6
Canada
Phone: 19053339900
County: 
Electoral District: 

1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

5546 Portage Rd,
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. Hariri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hariri ( CPSO# 96821 )

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:16 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2018 Active
 Dr. Arvin Hariri may practise medicine independently in Diagnostic
                  Radiology and low-risk, non-surgical cosmetic procedures.