skip to content

Harelnikava, Maryna Gennadievna

CPSO#: 99499

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jan 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Belarusian State Medical University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2120B Hwy 551
Mindemoya ON  P0P 1S0
Phone: (705) 377-5371
Fax: (705) 377-5372 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Stadnyk Jeeves Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jeeves ( CPSO# 62587 )
Dr. M. Harelnikava ( CPSO# 99499 )
Dr. K. O'Connor ( CPSO# 72515 )
Dr. M. Al Hadi ( CPSO# 84378 )
Dr. A. Stadnyk ( CPSO# 33598 )
Dr. M. Reade ( CPSO# 77096 )

Business Address:
2120B Highway 551
P.O. Box 150
Mindemoya ON  P0P 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 377-5371


Corporation Name: Dr. Maryna Harelnikava Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Harelnikava ( CPSO# 99499 )

Business Address:
2120 B Highway 551
P.O. Box 150
Mindemoya ON  P0P 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 377-5371

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Manitoulin Health Centre,Mindemoya Site Mindemoya

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARYNA GENNADIEVNA HARELNIKAVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARELNIKAVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2015