skip to content

Harel, David Orr

CPSO#: 100507

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidad Maimonides, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Psychiatry
Room 4418
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8955 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 24 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID ORR HAREL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAREL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 24 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2018