skip to content

Hardy-St-Pierre, Godefroy

CPSO#: 87362

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 16 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 04 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 05 Jul 2008 to 04 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 05 Jul 2009 to 04 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 05 Jul 2010 to 04 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 05 Jul 2011 to 04 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 05 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2016
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 16 Aug 2018