skip to content

Hardy-Brown, Karolyn Wendy

CPSO#: 85110

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Hardy, Karolyn Wendy (used until: 23 Jul 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Suite 302
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone: (705) 740-6841
Fax: (705) 740-6891 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. Brown & Hardy-Brown Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Brown ( CPSO# 81300 )
Dr. K. Hardy-Brown ( CPSO# 85110 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
ICU A3
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5063

Business Address:
Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Suite 302
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone Number: (705) 740-6841

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAROLYN WENDY HARDY-BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARDY-BROWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 03 Jul 2006 to 30 Jul 2006
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 11 Feb 2008 to 09 Mar 2008
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2009