skip to content

Hardy, Douglas Vann

CPSO#: 30689

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: CPM Health Centre Unit B22 550 Terminal Avenue Ottawa, ON K1G 0Z3
Date Received: 21 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jan 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014