skip to content

Hardwick, James Mundy

CPSO#: 29347

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Apr 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Apr 2017
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 13 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Apr 2017

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 27 Mar 2019
Summary:

On March 27, 2019, on the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission on Liability, 
 the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Hardwick committed an act of professional misconduct, 
 in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard 
 to all circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional. 
  
 AGREED STATEMENT OF FACTS AND ADMISSION ON LIABILITY 
 Dr. Hardwick received his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice in 1975. 
 On April 11, 2017, during the College’s investigation, Dr. Hardwick resigned his membership in 
 the College. Prior to his resignation, Dr. Hardwick was a general surgeon practising in Stratford, 
 Ontario. 
  
 In 2016, Dr. Hardwick’s practice included providing services in the Stratford General Hospital’s 
 Surgical Ambulatory Care outpatient clinic (“SAC”), and surgical assisting in the operating 
 room. The Stratford General Hospital is one hospital in the Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance 
 (“HPHA”). 
  
 On July 22, 2016, the College received a mandatory report from the President and CEO of 
 HPHA, about Dr. Hardwick’s behaviour and comments towards Patient A in May and June 
 2016. 
  
 May 2016 
 Patient A was a teenage student. She developed a pilonidal abscess, located near the tailbone. 
 Patient A attended at the Stratford General Hospital’s SAC on referral from a family physician 
 for an excision by Dr. Hardwick because an earlier excision had not been successful. Patient A 
 was accompanied on this visit by a student coordinator. Dr. Hardwick explained that he was 
 going to open the patient’s abscess to take the pressure off. 
  
 When Dr. Hardwick made the incision, he commented on the unusual severity of the infection, 
 including stating that she was a teenager and the smell was worse than he expected. Dr. 
 Hardwick failed to explain that he was making the comment with respect to the severity of her 
 condition. His comment caused the patient distress 
  
 June 2016 
 Patient A returned to the SAC for follow-up with Dr. Hardwick to have her dressings changed, 
 and to have her wound examined to ensure that it was healing properly. 
 Patient A was accompanied on this appointment by the student coordinator. Throughout this 
 appointment, the patient was lying prone on the examination table with her buttocks exposed. 
Dr. Hardwick instructed the nurse to remove the bandage residue from the patient’s buttocks. 
He made statements purporting to compliment the patient on her physical appearance. He also 
made inappropriate comments about the standards for cosmetic appearance in her culture, 
adding that because the patient was from her country of origin, she was probably accustomed to 
getting compliments on her appearance. 
The student coordinator told Dr. Hardwick that it was not appropriate for him to be commenting 
on the patient’s physical appearance. In response, Dr. Hardwick stated that he was only joking, 
and said “These government types are so uptight. They don’t know a good joke when they hear 
one.” 
After the June 2016 appointment, Dr. Hardwick telephoned the student coordinator to apologize 
for how he had acted and for the way he had spoken about the patient. He stated that he thought 
the patient was mature enough to handle jokes of that nature, and that it was his fault for not 
recognizing her lack of maturity. 

Dr. Hardwick admits these facts, and admits that, based on these facts, he engaged in 
professional misconduct, in that he engaged in acts or omissions relevant to the practice of 
medicine that would be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
AGREED STATEMENT OF FACTS ON PENALTY 
Dr. Hardwick entered into an undertaking to the College on March 20, 2019, by which he agreed 
not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any 
other jurisdiction effective March 27, 2019. 

DISPOSITION 
The Discipline Committee Ordered that: 

    -  Dr. Hardwick attend before the panel to be reprimanded. 
    -  Dr. Hardwick pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within thirty (30) 
       days.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): March 27, 2019 9:00 start

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: March 27, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. James Mundy Hardwick to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 27, 2019:

Dr. Hardwick was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Hardwick resigned from the College on April 11, 2017. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Hardwick has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)