skip to content

Hards, Andrea Margaret

CPSO#: 93919

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leeds, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia, 1SE 157
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St
Toronto, ON, M2K 1E1
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6520 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Andrea Hards Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hards ( CPSO# 93919 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6520

Business Address:
Suite 225
162 Cumberland Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3N5

Business Address:
Suite 345
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:07 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREA MARGARET HARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARDS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2010
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2012