skip to content

Harding, Lorin Gilbert

CPSO#: 30345

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 May 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 08 May 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 2018

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: May 31, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Lorin Gilbert Harding to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 31, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Harding failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his infection control practices. During the investigation, Dr. Harding resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)