skip to content

Harding, Lacey Mairi

CPSO#: 98441

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
36 York Mills Road
Suite 100
Toronto ON  M2P 2E9
Phone: (416) 551-5070
Fax: 416-551-5013 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Lacey Harding Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Harding ( CPSO# 98441 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
36 York Mills Road
Toronto ON  M2P 2E9
Phone Number: (416) 551-5070

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LACEY MAIRI HARDING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARDING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017