skip to content

Harder, Carroll Diann

CPSO#: 84914

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St.Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 631-2020 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: C.D. Harder Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Harder ( CPSO# 84914 )

Business Address:
St. Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CARROLL DIANN HARDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008