skip to content

Harbut, Ronald Eugene

CPSO#: 94606

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Feb 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 2013