skip to content

Haran, Ambika

CPSO#: 95129

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Ganeshamoorthy, Ambika (used until: 30 May 2019 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Pennsylvania State University Coll of Me, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton McMaster Family
Health Centre
Suite 103
1221 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 1A0
Phone: (905) 333-8222
Fax: (905) 333-9343 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Peel Public Health
325 Central Parkway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3X9
Canada
Phone: 905-270-0587
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Peel Memorial Hospital
20 Lynch Street
Brampton, ON
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6W 3E1
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ambika Haran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Haran ( CPSO# 95129 )

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
1221 Lakeshore Road
Suite 103
Burlington ON  L7S 1A0
Phone Number: (905) 333-8222

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
325 Central Parkway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3X9
Phone Number: (905) 270-0587

Business Address:
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2X8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMBIKA HARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Mar 2015 to 03 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014