skip to content

Haque, Nihal

CPSO#: 98064

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Senior's Health Centre Clinic
2 Buchan Court
North York ON  M2J 5A3
Phone: 416-756-6050 Ext. 8093
Fax: 416-756-1844 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nihal Haque and Dr. Abeyat Zaman-Haque Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 25 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Haque ( CPSO# 98064 )
Dr. A. Zaman-Haque ( CPSO# 98500 )

Business Address:
503-1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 226-4294

Business Address:
Senior's Health Centre Clinic
2 Buchan Court
North York ON  M2J 5A3
Phone Number: (416) 756-6050

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NIHAL HAQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAQUE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016