skip to content

Haq, Sheira

CPSO#: 97126

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 May 2022
EXPIRY DATE
02 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi, Urdu

Education: University of Dhaka, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sheira Haq Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 4 2019

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Safa medical and Walk in clinic and pharmacy . 16 main street North . Markham , Ont L3P1X2
Date Received: 30 Apr 2022


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Bangladesh
Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 May 2022