skip to content

Hanson, Peter George

CPSO#: 24782

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University Of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Peter G. Hanson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 12 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 15 Jun 1971 to 14 Jun 1972
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1972
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 27 Oct 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2015