skip to content

Hansen, Shandi Michelle

CPSO#: 96855

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 28 Sep 2011
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Univ of California, San Francisco, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
200 Elizabeth Street
R F E G S 480
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3856 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-2581
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 12 Sep 2018
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 13 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2019 Active
             Dr.  Shandi  Michelle  Hansen  may practise medicine independently in emergency
            medicine and palliative care medicine, only.