skip to content

Hanrahan, Renee Melanie

CPSO#: 77689

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite LL4
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 735-9300
Fax: (705) 735-9391 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Renee M. Hanrahan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 9 2022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RENEE MELANIE HANRAHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANRAHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2007