Hannon, Breffni Louise (CPSO#: 96634)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2013

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Department of Supportive Care
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2000 Ext. 2508
Fax: (416) 946-2866
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Breffni Hannon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hannon ( CPSO# 96634 )

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Supportive Care
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective: 01 Jul 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Mar 2018 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 03 Oct 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 10 Nov 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Breffni Louise Hannon may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Medical Oncology, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Hannon holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Hannon  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Hannon's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Hannon's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2013.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on June 30, 2020.