skip to content

Hanna, Wedad Morcas

CPSO#: 29791

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Feb 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Feb 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alexandria, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
E432
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 3565
Fax: (416) 480-4271 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wedad Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Hanna ( CPSO# 29791 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
E432 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 23 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WEDAD MORCAS HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1978