skip to content

Hanna, Sameh -

CPSO#: 90316

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Mar 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 25 Mar 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Pennsylvania State University Coll of Me, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
29 Park Road
Toronto ON  M4W 2N2
Phone: (416) 922-9620
Fax: (416) 922-4358 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

34 Park Road
Toronto ON  M4W 2N4
Canada
Phone: 416-962-0123
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sameh Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hanna ( CPSO# 90316 )

Business Address:
29 Park Road
Toronto ON  M4W 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 922-9620

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5953

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:25 Mar 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Mar 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Aug 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2010 Active
             Dr. Sameh Hanna may practise medicine independently in dermatology, only.