skip to content

Hanna, Ramez Raafat

CPSO#: 89370

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000 Ext. 1502 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ramez R. Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hanna ( CPSO# 89370 )

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7373

Business Address:
4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1S4
Phone Number: (905) 852-9771

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAMEZ RAAFAT HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015