skip to content

Hanna, Moshira M

CPSO#: 94438

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 May 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Feb 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:St. George's University School of Medici, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2010 to 18 Oct 2010
PEAP - R - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

Queen's University, 25 Oct 2011 to 10 Feb 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 11 Feb 2012 to 10 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 11 Feb 2013 to 06 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2013