skip to content

Hanna, Michelle Rosalie

CPSO#: 100626

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 103
18 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5E 1Z8
Phone: (647) 748-5663
Fax: (647) 740-7166 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michelle Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hanna ( CPSO# 100626)

Business Address:
103 - 18 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5E 1Z8
Phone Number: (647) 748-5663

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHELLE ROSALIE HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015