skip to content

Hanna, Mariam Alfy

CPSO#: 97011

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Nov 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Nov 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5500 North Service Road, Unit 106
Burlington ON  L7L 6W6
Phone: 9053159543
Fax: 9055922299 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mariam Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hanna ( CPSO# 97011 )

Business Address:
Suite 106
5500 North Service Road
Burlington ON  L7L 6W6
Phone Number: (905) 315-9543

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:18 Nov 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective:18 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIAM ALFY HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 21 Nov 2011 to 18 Dec 2011
EL - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 19 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 18 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 19 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 18 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2015