skip to content

Hanna, Brian Davison

CPSO#: 22163

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jan 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jan 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Brian D. Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Oct 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2019