skip to content

Hanna, Bassem Matta Nashed

CPSO#: 91944

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Mar 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Mar 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: 4165484039
Fax: 6477225440 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

156 North Front St
Belleville ON  K8P 3B8
Canada
Phone: 6137798143
Fax: 6137791397
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Bassem Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 2 2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Egypt

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:31 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BASSEM MATTA NASHED HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 22 Oct 2009
AVP - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2019