skip to content

Hanna, Albert Hanna Henin

CPSO#: 92174

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Oct 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glazier Medical Centre
Department of Family Medicine
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone: (905) 579-1228 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hanna ( CPSO# 92174 )

Business Address:
Glazier Medical Centre
Department of Family Medicine
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone Number: (905) 579-1228

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:20 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALBERT HANNA HENIN HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2009 to 11 Jan 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Jan 2010 to 19 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2011