skip to content

Hanmiah, Rajeshwar

CPSO#: 91852

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 16 Sep 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greater Niagara General Hospital
General Site
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: (905) 358-8435 Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 18 Sep 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 18 Sep 2020 Active
 A)	Practice Restriction

(i)	Within 20 days of this Order, Dr. Hanmiah may never be the only physician practicing in the Emergency Room.  For further clarity, there must always be another physician scheduled to work at the same time as him.

B)	Clinical Supervision

(i)	Within 20 days of the date of this Order, Dr. Hanmiah must obtain a clinical supervisor ("Clinical Supervisor") who is acceptable to the College, who has signed an undertaking in the form attached hereto as Schedule "A". 
 
(ii)	Dr. Hanmiah  will practice under moderate supervision as outlined in the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking and the Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached to this Order as Schedule "C".  The Clinical Supervisor will, on a bi-weekly basis, for three (3) months, observe Dr. Hanmiah  in practice for half (0.5) a day every month and review a minimum of fifteen (15) of Dr. Hanmiah's patient charts, discuss Dr. Hanmiah's care and treatment plan, identify any concerns regarding the care and treatment plan, and make recommendations for improvement.   

(iii)	The Clinical Supervisor shall submit a report to the College every month for the first three (3) months, and will keep a log of all patient charts reviewed along with patient identifiers.

(iv)	After three (3) months, the Clinical Supervisor will, for nine (9) months, visit Dr. Hanmiah's practice no less than monthly, review a minimum of  fifteen (15) of Dr. Hanmiah's patient charts, discuss Dr. Hanmiah's care and treatment plan, identify any concerns regarding the care and treatment plan, and make recommendations for improvement.   

(v)	The Clinical Supervisor shall submit a report to the College three (3) months for the nine (9) months described at (iv), and will keep a log of all patient charts reviewed along with patient identifiers.

(vi)	If Dr. Hanmiah  is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor as set out in B(i) above, or if the Clinical Supervisor and Dr. Hanmiah  have terminated their clinical supervision arrangement, Dr. Hanmiah  must cease practising until such time as he has obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.

C)	Monitoring Terms

(i)		Dr. Hanmiah shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. 	arising from the implementation of any of the terms of this Order. 

(ii)		Dr. Hanmiah shall provide the College with his irrevocable consent to make appropriate 	enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan, in order for the College to monitor his compliance with the terms of this Order,
 and shall consent to the disclosure by his Clinical Supervisor and to the College of all information necessary to fulfill the Clinical Supervisor's Undertaking and to monitor Dr. Hanmiah's compliance with the Order.

(iii)		Dr. Hanmiah shall permit and not interfere with unannounced inspections of his practice by a 	College representative in order to monitor the terms of the Order. 

(iv)		Dr. Hanmiah  must inform the College of each and every location that he practices, including, 	but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s) in any jurisdiction within five (5) days of this Order and within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.


Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: July 11, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)