skip to content

Hanlan, Amy Katherine Lindsey

CPSO#: 97471

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Feb 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: GF Strong Rehabilitation Centre 4255 Laurel St Vancouver, BC V5Z 2G9 Phone: 604-734-1313
Date Received: 23 May 2018


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 07 May 2012 to 03 Jun 2012
EL - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 11 Mar 2014 to 05 May 2014
EL - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018