skip to content

Hanif, Hasib Mohammed

CPSO#: 94151

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Oct 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4019-300 Prince Philip Dr
Health Sciences Centre
Division of Cardiac Surgery
St. John's NL  A1B 3X5

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HASIB MOHAMMED HANIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANIF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 04 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 05 Jul 2011 to 04 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 05 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 04 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 05 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 04 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 05 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 04 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 05 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Sep 2018
CF - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2016