skip to content

Haney, Colleen Michelle

CPSO#: 85000

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201 Deacon Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 2J6
Phone: (613) 732-3675 Ext. 7209
Fax: (613) 732-2085 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Colleen Haney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Haney ( CPSO# 85000 )

Business Address:
201 Deacon Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 2J6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. COLLEEN MICHELLE HANEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011