skip to content

Hanel, Erich Gregory

CPSO#: 92495

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Feb 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Feb 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
50 Charlton Ave
Hamilton Ontario
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33112
Fax: (905) 521-6017 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hanel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Hanel ( CPSO# 92495 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jan 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:19 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERICH GREGORY HANEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2010